KS HB2313 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2313 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Providing for reimbursement of property taxes for certain business shutdowns or restrictions, allowing Kansas national guard and reservist members who are in good standing to receive a property tax exemption for up to two motor vehicles, authorizing continuation of the statewide levy for schools and the exemption of a portion of residential property from such levy, authorizing appointment by the governor of a member pro tempore when a vacancy on the state board of tax appeals exists and directing post audit study of the impact of non-profit and governmental entities competing against for-profit businesses.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2313 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Providing for reimbursement of property taxes for certain business shutdowns or restrictions, allowing Kansas national guard and reservist members who are in good standing to receive a property tax exemption for up to two motor vehicles, authorizing continuation of the statewide levy for schools and the exemption of a portion of residential property from such levy, authorizing appointment by the governor of a member pro tempore when a vacancy on the state board of tax appeals exists and directing post audit study of the impact of non-profit and governmental entities competing against for-profit businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 108 Nay: 3 (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 0 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 11 Nay: 27 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 6 (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Part One retained. - Yea: 35 Nay: 0 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 0 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 11 Nay: 27 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 6 (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Part One retained. - Yea: 35 Nay: 0 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 108 Nay: 3 |
2021-05-07 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 3(f) adopted. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 0 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-05-07 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Smith, A., Representative Mason and Representative Gartner appointed as second conferees |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Claeys, Senator Alley and Senator Corson appointed as second conferees |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 11 Nay: 27 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Alley and Senator Holland appointed as conferees |
2021-05-06 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Smith, A. , Representative Mason and Representative Gartner as conferees |
2021-05-06 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 33 Nay: 6 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Part Two retained. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Part One retained. Yea: 35 Nay: 0 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Senator Sykes motioned to divide the question into two parts. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-04 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-02-24 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-02-10 | House | House Introduced |