KS HB2312 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain political party committee treasurers from liability for certain violations under the campaign finance act.
Title
Exempting certain political party committee treasurers from liability for certain violations under the campaign finance act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2023-03-16 | House | House Hearing continuation: Thursday, March 16, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Elections |
2023-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Elections; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-21 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 21, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2023-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2023-02-07 | House | House Introduced |