KS HB2305 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 02 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 02 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas storage tank act and containment of underground storage tanks.
Title
Kansas storage tank act and containment of underground storage tanks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 02 April 2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2013 |
2013-03-22 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 15, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 159-S CANCELLED |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 15, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2013-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy and Environment |
2013-02-12 | House | House Introduced |