KS HB2295 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water pollution control permits and creating the water program management fund.
Title
Water pollution control permits and creating the water program management fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2013-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2013-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-02-12 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2295/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2295_00_0000.pdf |