KS HB2263 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approving the operation and use of electric-assisted bicycles and regulating the use thereof.
Title
Approving the operation and use of electric-assisted bicycles and regulating the use thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-08 | House | House Introduced |