KS HB2243 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting animal shelters from registration requirements as a charitable organization.
Title
Exempting animal shelters from registration requirements as a charitable organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 6 (Y: 118 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 6 |
2019-02-27 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | House | House Introduced |