KS HB2241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the surface water protection fee and the irrigation water use fee and depositing such fees in the state water plan fund.
Title
Creating the surface water protection fee and the irrigation water use fee and depositing such fees in the state water plan fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Water and Environment |
2017-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Water and Environment; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 582-N |
2017-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water and Environment |
2017-02-01 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2241/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2241_00_0000.pdf |