KS HB2235 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Kansas sales and compensating use tax, administration and reporting requirements.
Title
Concerning Kansas sales and compensating use tax, administration and reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 104 Nay: 21 (Y: 104 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-04-04 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 104 Nay: 21 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, April 3, 2017 |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-01 | House | House Introduced |