KS HB2223 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2223 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs—Alcoholic beverages; homemade fermented beverages; microbrewery gallonage expanded; liquor license length of citizenship.
Title
Substitute for HB 2223 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs—Alcoholic beverages; homemade fermented beverages; microbrewery gallonage expanded; liquor license length of citizenship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 115 Nay: 9 (Y: 115 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 7 (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 7 (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014 |
2014-04-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 11, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 115 Nay: 9 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Ostmeyer, Senator Shultz and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2014-03-31 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Brunk , Representative Couture-Lovelady and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 05, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-02-10 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 111 Nay: 7 |
2014-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2014-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2013-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-02-05 | House | House Introduced |