KS HB2213 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, 07 June 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, 07 June 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Member elections and retirement benefit determinations and one-time payments under KPERS act of 2015.
Title
Member elections and retirement benefit determinations and one-time payments under KPERS act of 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 104 Nay: 0 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 0 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 0 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, 07 June 2013 |
2013-05-28 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 28, 2013 |
2013-05-22 | House | House Reengrossed on Tuesday, 21 May 2013 |
2013-05-20 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 104 Nay: 0 |
2013-05-20 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator King, Senator Masterson and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2013-04-02 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Johnson , Representative Howell and Representative Wolfe Moore as conferees |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-15 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 115 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-15 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, 14 February 2013 |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 08, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 152-S |
2013-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Pensions and Benefits |
2013-02-05 | House | House Introduced |