KS HB2210 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 25 March 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 25 March 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; change of party affiliation.
Title
Elections; change of party affiliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was rejected - Yea: 13 Nay: 26 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 72 Nay: 49 (Y: 72 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed - Yea: 60 Nay: 62 (Y: 60 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was rejected - Yea: 13 Nay: 26 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 72 Nay: 49 (Y: 72 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed - Yea: 60 Nay: 62 (Y: 60 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 25 March 2014 |
2014-03-21 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 27 Nay: 12 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 26 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator McGinn |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 05, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 159-S CANCELED |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 06, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-06 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, 01 March 2013 |
2013-03-01 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 72 Nay: 49 |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-01 | House | House Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed Yea: 60 Nay: 62 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sawyer was rejected |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sawyer |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2013-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2013-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2013-02-04 | House | House Introduced |