KS HB2182 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing growth of Kansas agribusiness through development of an industrial hemp industry; enacting the Kansas agricultural industry growth act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing growth of Kansas agribusiness through development of an industrial hemp industry; enacting the Kansas agricultural industry growth act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 103 Nay: 18 (Y: 103 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2017-03-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2017-03-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2017-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 103 Nay: 18
2017-03-27HouseHouse Engrossed on Friday, March 24, 2017
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith, E. was adopted
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Smith, E.
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Dove was adopted
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Dove
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2017-02-20HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2017-02-17HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-15HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 112-N
2017-01-26HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2017-01-26HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback