KS HB2140 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing sales tax authority for Dickinson, Finney, Jackson, Russell, Thomas and Wabaunsee counties; specifying certain county sales tax collection requirements of director of taxation; and providing a sales tax exemption for sales of certain coins or bullion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing sales tax authority for Dickinson, Finney, Jackson, Russell, Thomas and Wabaunsee counties; specifying certain county sales tax collection requirements of director of taxation; and providing a sales tax exemption for sales of certain coins or bullion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 98 Nay: 26 (Y: 98 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 33 Nay: 7 (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a new conference failed. - Yea: 11 Nay: 19 (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
2019-05-29HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 10, 2019
2019-05-04HouseHouse Engrossed on Monday, May 6, 2019
2019-05-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 26
2019-05-04HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 33 Nay: 7
2019-05-02SenateSenate Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a new conference failed. Yea: 11 Nay: 19
2019-05-02SenateSenate Motion to adopt Conference Committee Report
2019-05-02SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-02SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2019-05-01HouseHouse Representative Johnson, Representative Mason, and Representative Gartner are appointed to replace Representative Kelly, Representative Orr, and Representative Finney on the Conference Committee
2019-04-01SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Billinger and Senator Ware appointed as conferees
2019-04-01HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kelly , Representative Orr and Representative Finney as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:33 AM Room 546-S
2019-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2019-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED
2019-02-05HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2019-02-05HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback