KS HB2126 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 08 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 08 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating risk-based capital instructions effective date, expiration date for property and casualty actuarial opinion law and increasing the cap on consulting fees for certain insurance companies.
Title
Updating risk-based capital instructions effective date, expiration date for property and casualty actuarial opinion law and increasing the cap on consulting fees for certain insurance companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 08 , 2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 03, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-12 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-05 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 02, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 152S |
2015-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2015-01-26 | House | House Introduced |