KS HB2125 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas expanded lottery act; south central Kansas gaming zone restrictions.
Title
Kansas expanded lottery act; south central Kansas gaming zone restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - House - House Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed - Yea: 55 Nay: 67 (Y: 55 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 71 Nay: 50 (Y: 71 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 71 Nay: 50 (Y: 71 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Conference |
2014-04-04 | House | House Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed; Yea: 55 Nay: 67 (Remains in Conference) |
2014-04-01 | House | House Representative Menghini replaces Representative Ruiz on the Conference Committee |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Ostmeyer, Senator Shultz and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2014-03-31 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Brunk , Representative Hawkins and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 12 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Interstate Cooperation; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 71 Nay: 50 |
2013-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 07, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 346-S-CANCELLED |
2013-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2013-01-29 | House | House Introduced |