KS HB2091 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a refundable income tax credit for certain purchases of food and discontinuing the nonrefundable food sales tax credit.
Title
Providing a refundable income tax credit for certain purchases of food and discontinuing the nonrefundable food sales tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 28, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-01-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-01-21 | House | House Introduced |