KS HB2056 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2056 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Clarifying the eligibility requirements to obtain a license to carry a concealed handgun under the personal and family protection act.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2056 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Clarifying the eligibility requirements to obtain a license to carry a concealed handgun under the personal and family protection act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 77 Nay: 45 (Y: 77 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate Calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 77 Nay: 45 |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2023-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2023-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2023-01-18 | House | House Introduced |