KS HB2056 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2056 - by Committee on Taxation - Permitted use of tax information in certain tax actions and proceedings; tax warrants.
Title
Substitute for HB 2056 - by Committee on Taxation - Permitted use of tax information in certain tax actions and proceedings; tax warrants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2014-01-29 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2014-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 27, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2014-01-17 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 582-N-CANCELLED |
2014-01-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 04, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2013-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-01-23 | House | House Introduced |