KS HB2056 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financial institutions; trust examinations and annual assessments.
Title
Financial institutions; trust examinations and annual assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011 | |
2011-04-01 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-03-21 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | |
2011-02-09 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-07 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 | |
2011-01-28 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Financial Institutions | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced |