KS HB2035 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing uniformity in the issuance of citations for violations of the Kansas cereal malt beverage act by ABC; imposition of liquor enforcement tax.
Title
Providing uniformity in the issuance of citations for violations of the Kansas cereal malt beverage act by ABC; imposition of liquor enforcement tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 122 Nay: 2 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Givens was adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Givens |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-01-29 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 24, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 23, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2019-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-16 | House | House Introduced |