KS HB2035 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the subject matter of criminal post-trial motions for correction of sentence.
Title
Clarifying the subject matter of criminal post-trial motions for correction of sentence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 17, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 17, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-08 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-01-30 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-18 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 18, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-11 | House | House Introduced |