KS HB2034 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2034 by Committee on Judiciary - Requiring restitution be due immediately unless the court orders a payment plan.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2034 by Committee on Judiciary - Requiring restitution be due immediately unless the court orders a payment plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 114 Nay: 3 (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 101 Nay: 15 (Y: 101 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 101 Nay: 15 (Y: 101 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 26, 2020 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 114 Nay: 3 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report adopted |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-08 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 7, 2019 |
2019-02-08 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 101 Nay: 15 |
2019-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-04 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 24, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-16 | House | House Introduced |