KS HB2018 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 17 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 17 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2018 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice – Adding and amending substances included in schedules I, III and IV of the uniform controlled substances act; use of certain controlled substances to treat binge eating authorized.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2018 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice – Adding and amending substances included in schedules I, III and IV of the uniform controlled substances act; use of certain controlled substances to treat binge eating authorized.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 17 , 2016 |
2016-06-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 09, 2016 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Reengrossed on Sunday, May 01 , 2016 |
2016-04-29 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2016-04-29 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-27 | House | House Representative Finch replaces Representative Pauls on the Conference Committee |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Smith, Senator Knox and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees |
2016-03-24 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Gonzalez , Representative Pauls and Representative Highberger as conferees |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator O'Donnell was adopted |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator O'Donnell |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Special Committee on Education |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2016, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-02-10 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 09 , 2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2016-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 01, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2016-01-25 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-02-20 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 03, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 152S |
2015-01-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-01-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | House | House Introduced |