KS H2369 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by gov. -HJ 780
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by gov. -HJ 780
Summary
Energy conservation and electric generation, transmission, efficiency and air emissions. Effective date:
Title
Energy conservation and electric generation, transmission, efficiency and air emissions. Effective date:
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by gov. -HJ 780 | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 783 | |
2009-05-08 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -HJ 780; Concurred; Yeas 103 Nays 18 -HJ 721 | |
2009-05-07 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -SJ 850; COW: CR recommending sub. bill be adptd; Sub. be passed -SJ 850; EFA: Passed; Yeas 37 Nays 2 -SJ 853 | |
2009-05-06 | CR: Substitute be passed by Utilities -SJ 819 | |
2009-05-05 | Withdrawn from Ways and Means -SJ 800; Referred to Utilities -SJ 800 | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 532 | |
2009-03-25 | Received and introduced -SJ 491 | |
2009-03-24 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 118 Nays 6 -HJ 404 | |
2009-03-23 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 372; Engrossed -HJ 399 | |
2009-03-19 | CR: Be passed as am. by Appropriations -HJ 325 | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to Appropriations -HJ 267 | |
2009-03-09 | Introduced -HJ 262 | |
2009-05-28 | . |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |