KS H2315 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Restricting driving privileges for persons for refusal, failure or high BAC in test to driving with ignition interlock devices. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Restricting driving privileges for persons for refusal, failure or high BAC in test to driving with ignition interlock devices. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-02-27 | Withdrawn from Appropriations -HJ 243; Rereferred to Judiciary -HJ 243 | |
2009-02-25 | Hearing: Wed., 3/04/09, 3:30PM, Rm 143-N | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn from Judiciary -HJ 153; Referred to Appropriations -HJ 153 | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 136 | |
2009-02-06 | Introduced -HJ 135 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |