KS H2099 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Approved by gov. -HJ 780
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Approved by gov. -HJ 780
Summary
Open records; public agency not required to disclose certain information relating to alleged victims of stalking, domestic violence or sexual assault. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Open records; public agency not required to disclose certain information relating to alleged victims of stalking, domestic violence or sexual assault. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Approved by gov. -HJ 780 | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 699 | |
2009-05-04 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -HJ 696; Concurred; Yeas 117 Nays 0 -HJ 697 | |
2009-05-01 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -SJ 774; COW: CR recommending sub. bill be adptd; Sub. be passed -SJ 794; EFA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 795 | |
2009-04-30 | CR: Substitute be passed by Federal and State Affairs -SJ 771 | |
2009-04-29 | Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 762; Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 762 | |
2009-03-04 | Hearing: 3/10/2009, Tues, 9:30 am, Rm 545-N | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 216 | |
2009-02-18 | Received and introduced -SJ 200 | |
2009-02-18 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 116 Nays 9 -HJ 183 | |
2009-02-17 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 176; Engrossed -HJ 192 | |
2009-02-12 | CR: Be passed as am. by Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 159 | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 74; Hearing: Tues.,2/3/09, 1:30PM, Rm 535-N | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced -HJ 67 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |