IN SCR0011 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-11)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-11)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the Indiana Legislative Youth Advisory Council. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the Indiana Legislative Youth Advisory Council.
Title
Recognizing the Indiana Legislative Youth Advisory Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2023-02-06 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senators Alexander, Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Byrne, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Gaskill, Glick, Holdman, Hunley, Johnson, Koch, Leising, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Sandlin, Tomes, Walker G, Walker K, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Bauer M |
2023-01-31 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Jordan |
2023-01-31 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Authored by Senators Garten, Taylor G, Bray |
Subjects
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/11 |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/11#1.INTR |