IN SCR0011 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-12)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-12)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing James C. Cummings, Jr., and urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to name I-465 from mile marker 44.5 to mile marker 45.5 the "James C. Cummings, Jr., Memorial Mile".
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing James C. Cummings, Jr., and urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to name I-465 from mile marker 44.5 to mile marker 45.5 the "James C. Cummings, Jr., Memorial Mile".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 195: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Porter added as cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Summers added as cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-27 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second author |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senators Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Boehnlein, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Holdman, Houchin, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker G, Walker K, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors |
2022-01-20 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |