IN SCR0002 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting continuation of Medicaid quality advisory committee.
Title
Supporting continuation of Medicaid quality advisory committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Returned to the Senate | |
2010-02-16 | First reading: adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-19 | Senator Simpson added as second author | |
2010-01-19 | House sponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-19 | Second reading: adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Lawson |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2010&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SCR&docno=0002 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2010/SRESF/SC0002.html |