IN SB0608 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 265
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 265
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a sales tax exclusion for postage that is separately stated on the invoice, bill of sale, or similar document. Defines postage charges. Revises the sourcing rules under the sales and use tax for advertising and promotional direct mail and other direct mail by creating two distinct categories of direct mail in compliance with the Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement. Adds corresponding definitions. Removes a separate sales tax exemption for blood glucose monitoring equipment and devices. Provides that the sales tax exemption for blood glucose monitoring supplies, including blood glucose meters, measuring strips, lancets, and other similar diabetic supplies, currently applicable to supplies furnished without charge also applies to the sale of the supplies.
Title
State sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 265 |
2013-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 608: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 530: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-11 | House | House advisors appointed: T. Brown, Leonard, Klinker, Porter and Pryor |
2013-04-11 | House | House conferees appointed: M. Smith and Goodin |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Hershman, Broden and Mishler |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Kenley and Skinner |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 308: yeas 94, nays 3 |
2013-03-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Goodin |
2013-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. M. Smith |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second author |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley |