IN SB0559 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 238
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various criminal law matters. Adds unlawful possession of a firearm by a serious violent felon to the definition of "crimes of violence". Establishes new caps for consecutive sentences that result from a single episode of criminal conduct. Defines "emergency medical services provider". Provides that a person is a habitual offender if the state proves the person has been convicted of three prior unrelated felonies of any level. Allows the state to seek to have a person who allegedly committed a felony or misdemeanor, other than certain offenses, sentenced to an additional fixed term of imprisonment of between five and 20

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various criminal law matters. Adds unlawful possession of a firearm by a serious violent felon to the definition of "crimes of violence". Establishes new caps for consecutive sentences that result from a single episode of criminal conduct. Defines "emergency medical services provider". Provides that a person is a habitual offender if the state proves the person has been convicted of three prior unrelated felonies of any level. Allows the state to seek to have a person who allegedly committed a felony or misdemeanor, other than certain offenses, sentenced to an additional fixed term of imprisonment of between five and 20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenatePublic Law 238
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 570: yeas 42, nays 7
2015-04-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-29SenateDissent withdrawn
2015-04-16HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Frizzell, Pierce and Dvorak
2015-04-16HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Washburne and DeLaney
2015-04-15SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Waltz, Tallian, Schneider and Miller Patricia
2015-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Young R Michael and Taylor
2015-04-15SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-15SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-14HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-13HouseRepresentative Hamm added as cosponsor
2015-04-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 402: yeas 96, nays 0
2015-04-09HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-04-07HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as cosponsor
2015-04-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-05HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-05SenateSenator Crider added as coauthor
2015-02-05SenateRepresentative Frizzell added as sponsor
2015-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 42, nays 6
2015-02-03SenateAmendment #4 (Taylor) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-03SenateAmendment #1 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-02SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-27SenateSenator Steele added as coauthor
2015-01-20SenateSenator Schneider added as coauthor
2015-01-20SenateSenator Miller, Pat added as third author
2015-01-20SenateSenator Waltz added as second author
2015-01-20SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
2015-01-20SenateAuthored by Senator Young R Michael

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/559/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/7/1/4a717140/SB0559.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/d/f/bddfca30/SB0559.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/2/1/68216246/SB0559.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/0/6/ea06d3c7/SB0559.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/0/f/f70fdee0/SB0559.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/1/e/141e3bcd/SB0559.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/9/e/059e8121/SB0559.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/6/c/726c548d/SB0559.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/b/d/63bd43e6/SB0559.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/f/9/fff9f24b/SB0559.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/3/3/cb33fb6a/SB0559.99.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/6/e/ba6e8543/SB0559.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/7/d/b97d1334/SB0559.402.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/0/9/a709dcff/SB0559.570.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback