IN SB0554 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Precinct committeemen. Provides that in order for a precinct committeeman or a precinct vice committeeman (exercising the precinct committeeman's proxy) to participate in a caucus to fill a vacancy, the committeeman or vice committeeman must be entitled to vote for the office for which a successor is to be selected in the caucus.
Title
Precinct committeemen. Provides that in order for a precinct committeeman or a precinct vice committeeman (exercising the precinct committeeman's proxy) to participate in a caucus to fill a vacancy, the committeeman or vice committeeman must be entitled to vote for the office for which a successor is to be selected in the caucus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Crane removed as third author |
2017-02-13 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 26, nays 23 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Crane added as third author |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senators Freeman and Sandlin |