IN SB0532 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 237
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Human trafficking, promoting prostitution, and adult entertainment performers. Provides that, for purposes of the law concerning actions for indecent nuisances, an indecent nuisance includes a public place in or upon which human trafficking is conducted, permitted, continued, or exists, and the personal property and contents used in conducting and maintaining the place for such a purpose. Establishes the human trafficking prevention and victim assistance fund to fund human trafficking victim services and human trafficking prevention programs. Provides that: (1) 80% of money collected in the seizure of property used in connection with human trafficking will be transferred to the human

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking, promoting prostitution, and adult entertainment performers. Provides that, for purposes of the law concerning actions for indecent nuisances, an indecent nuisance includes a public place in or upon which human trafficking is conducted, permitted, continued, or exists, and the personal property and contents used in conducting and maintaining the place for such a purpose. Establishes the human trafficking prevention and victim assistance fund to fund human trafficking victim services and human trafficking prevention programs. Provides that: (1) 80% of money collected in the seizure of property used in connection with human trafficking will be transferred to the human

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenatePublic Law 237
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 536: yeas 47, nays 1
2015-04-28HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 564: yeas 97, nays 0
2015-04-27SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-27SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-27SenateConcurrrence withdrawn
2015-04-23SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-23SenateDissent withdrawn
2015-04-14HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Lehman, Cox, Lawson L and Pierce
2015-04-14HouseHouse Conferees appointed: McNamara and Hale
2015-04-02SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-02SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Houchin, Taylor and Brown L
2015-04-02SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Head and Tallian
2015-03-31SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-03-25HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-03-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 326: yeas 98, nays 0
2015-03-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-09HouseRepresentative Lawson added as cosponsor
2015-03-05HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2015-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-17SenateRepresentatives Cox and Hale added as cosponsors
2015-02-17SenateRepresentative McNamara added as sponsor
2015-02-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-02-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-14SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
2015-01-14SenateAuthored by Senators Head and Houchin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/532/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/7/4/f974ca17/SB0532.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/4/d/584d2e4d/SB0532.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/0/d/500dcb2d/SB0532.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/5/e/a15e83d8/SB0532.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/8/1/9581599d/SB0532.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/a/e/c8ae46e1/SB0532.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/6/2/46626343/SB0532.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/a/9/4ba942d3/SB0532.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/d/8/a7d81630/SB0532.180.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/2/e/032ea245/SB0532.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/a/d/21ad15fb/SB0532.326.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/f/e/a7fef39b/SB0532.564.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/f/1/5cf1df86/SB0532.536.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback