IN SB0488 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public defenders. Authorizes the Indiana public defender commission to create guidelines and requirements pertaining to a multicounty public defender's office. Authorizes a county executive to adopt an ordinance that allows the county to enter into an interlocal agreement with one or more counties for the purpose of: (1) creating a multicounty public defender's office; and (2) providing legal services to indigent persons located in the areas subject to the interlocal agreement. Requires interlocal agreements concerning indigent criminal defense to be administered by a joint board. Prohibits certain persons from acting as a member of a joint board. Specifies: (1) term limits; and (2) meeting requirements; for joint boards. Requires the auditor of one county belonging to an interlocal agreement to: (1) receive; (2) disburse; and (3) account for; all monies distributed to a multicounty public defender's office. Amends certain definitions. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Public defenders. Authorizes the Indiana public defender commission to create guidelines and requirements pertaining to a multicounty public defender's office. Authorizes a county executive to adopt an ordinance that allows the county to enter into an interlocal agreement with one or more counties for the purpose of: (1) creating a multicounty public defender's office; and (2) providing legal services to indigent persons located in the areas subject to the interlocal agreement. Requires interlocal agreements concerning indigent criminal defense to be administered by a joint board. Prohibits certain persons from acting as a member of a joint board. Specifies: (1) term limits; and (2) meeting requirements; for joint boards. Requires the auditor of one county belonging to an interlocal agreement to: (1) receive; (2) disburse; and (3) account for; all monies distributed to a multicounty public defender's office. Amends certain definitions. Makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. John Young [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public Law 69 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 367: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 356: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Steuerwald and Dvorak |
2019-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as third author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |