IN SB0456 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment insurance. Provides that any part of an unemployment insurance surcharge not used to pay interest on the advances made to the state from the federal unemployment trust fund must be credited against the total amount of benefits charged to the state's unemployment insurance trust fund before determining each employer's share of those benefits. Removes language that requires the extra surcharge amount be credited to each employer's experience account in proportion to the amount of the surcharge the employer paid. Establishes three categories of unemployment benefit overpayments: (1) overpayments because an individual knowingly makes a false statement or representation of
Title
Unemployment insurance. Provides that any part of an unemployment insurance surcharge not used to pay interest on the advances made to the state from the federal unemployment trust fund must be credited against the total amount of benefits charged to the state's unemployment insurance trust fund before determining each employer's share of those benefits. Removes language that requires the extra surcharge amount be credited to each employer's experience account in proportion to the amount of the surcharge the employer paid. Establishes three categories of unemployment benefit overpayments: (1) overpayments because an individual knowingly makes a false statement or representation of
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Daniel Leonard [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Tallian) failed (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Tallian) failed (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Leonard added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as second author |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 102: yeas 12, nays 37 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |