IN SB0449 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax audit contractor compensation. Extends the prohibition under current law against contracting for property tax audit services on a percentage basis to include any method that bases payments under the contract on increases of assessed value or property tax revenue that are attributable to the discovery of property that has been undervalued or omitted from assessment. Specifies conditions for intermediate distributions of property tax revenue that is collected before the expiration of a contract for property tax audit services. Provides that the term of a contract for property tax audit services may not exceed three years, including any extensions.
Title
Property tax audit contractor compensation. Extends the prohibition under current law against contracting for property tax audit services on a percentage basis to include any method that bases payments under the contract on increases of assessed value or property tax revenue that are attributable to the discovery of property that has been undervalued or omitted from assessment. Specifies conditions for intermediate distributions of property tax revenue that is collected before the expiration of a contract for property tax audit services. Provides that the term of a contract for property tax audit services may not exceed three years, including any extensions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 119 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 464: yeas 37, nays 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 381: yeas 96, nays 1 |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Aylesworth and Cherry |
2017-02-09 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Slager |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senators Walker and Charbonneau added as coauthors |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |