IN SB0436 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Public Law 249
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State and local taxation. Provides that if a taxpayer has personal property subject to assessment in more than one township in a county or has personal property that is subject to assessment and that is located in two or more taxing districts within the same township, the taxpayer shall file a single tax return with the county assessor. Provides that a personal property return notice must be filed with the county assessor, and not the township assessor, of the county in which the owner resides when the personal property is located in a different county. Provides a property tax exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and local taxation. Provides that if a taxpayer has personal property subject to assessment in more than one township in a county or has personal property that is subject to assessment and that is located in two or more taxing districts within the same township, the taxpayer shall file a single tax return with the county assessor. Provides that a personal property return notice must be filed with the county assessor, and not the township assessor, of the county in which the owner resides when the personal property is located in a different county. Provides a property tax exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House - Amendment #7 (Pryor) prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House - Amendment #8 (Pryor) failed (Y: 38 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06SenatePublic Law 249
2015-05-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 598: yeas 98, nays 0
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 571: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-04-23HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as advisor
2015-04-22SenateSenator Bassler added as advisor
2015-04-21HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Cherry, Price, VanNatter, Huston, Schaibley, Pryor and Goodin
2015-04-21SenateSenator Leising added as advisor
2015-04-21HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Brown T and Porter
2015-04-20SenateSenators Breaux and Eckerty added as advisors
2015-04-20SenateSenators Broden and Niemeyer removed as advisors
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Miller Pete, Broden and Niemeyer
2015-04-20SenateSenators Hershman and Broden added as conferees
2015-04-20SenateSenators Holdman and Breaux removed as conferees
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Holdman and Breaux
2015-04-20SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-20SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-16SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2015-04-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 451: yeas 92, nays 4
2015-04-14HouseAmendment #1 (Price) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14HouseAmendment #7 (Pryor) prevailed; Roll Call 426: yeas 95, nays 0
2015-04-14HouseAmendment #8 (Pryor) failed; Roll Call 425: yeas 38, nays 56
2015-04-14HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-12HouseRepresentative Huston added as cosponsor
2015-03-09HouseRepresentatives Cherry and Schaibley added as cosponsors
2015-03-05HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-24SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2015-02-24SenateSenator Raatz added as third author
2015-02-24SenateRepresentative Brown, T. added as sponsor
2015-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 251: yeas 49, nays 1
2015-02-23SenateSenator Miller, Pete added as second author
2015-02-23SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-10SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/436/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/d/7/00d7c045/SB0436.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/0/2/f20230b0/SB0436.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/a/c/20ace7bf/SB0436.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/3/6/6e36068e/SB0436.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/1/e/041e0cbb/SB0436.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/e/8/e4e8f82b/SB0436.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/7/c/c07c1cb1/SB0436.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/7/4/fa74640c/SB0436.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/3/a/603a03e6/SB0436.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/0/9/65097814/SB0436.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/1/e/091e0916/SB0436.251.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/5/5/27558fef/SB0436.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/6/6/9c66ffea/SB0436.425.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/f/7/76f7c41b/SB0436.426.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/9/e/4b9e238f/SB0436.451.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/f/c/b0fc3d3c/SB0436.598.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/1/7/6a17d3de/SB0436.571.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback