IN SB0425 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unclaimed life insurance benefits. Requires the department of insurance to develop, post, and maintain on the Internet information concerning life insurance and financial affairs. Specifies that the law concerning unclaimed life insurance benefits: (a) applies to policies, annuities, and retained asset accounts issued after June 30, 2015; and (b) does not prevent the attorney general from performing certain examinations of life insurance company records. Repeals a requirement for insurer procedures related to death master file search data.
Title
Unclaimed life insurance benefits. Requires the department of insurance to develop, post, and maintain on the Internet information concerning life insurance and financial affairs. Specifies that the law concerning unclaimed life insurance benefits: (a) applies to policies, annuities, and retained asset accounts issued after June 30, 2015; and (b) does not prevent the attorney general from performing certain examinations of life insurance company records. Repeals a requirement for insurer procedures related to death master file search data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Insurance - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Insurance - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Law 166 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 554: yeas 82, nays 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 526: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senator Arnold J removed as advisor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senator Arnold J added as conferee |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senator Mrvan removed as conferee |
2015-04-14 | House | House Advisors appointed: Carbaugh, Wright and Hale |
2015-04-14 | House | House Conferees appointed: Lehman and Austin |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Walker, Arnold J, Raatz and Perfect |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Holdman and Mrvan |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 365: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-30 | House | Representative Austin added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Lehman added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 248: yeas 37, nays 13 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second author |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |