IN SB0422 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Second reading: ordered engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Landlord tenant matters. Provides that, if a tenant refuses or neglects to pay rent and fees when due, a landlord may terminate the lease after giving not less than ten days notice, but not if the tenant pays the rent and fees in full before the notice period expires. Requires notice to a tenant regarding lease termination to include a statement about failure to pay rent and fees. Provides that notice is not required to terminate a formal or informal lease in certain situations. Requires a court to hear a cause of action filed by a tenant to enforce an obligation of a landlord no later than 30 days after the date of filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord tenant matters. Provides that, if a tenant refuses or neglects to pay rent and fees when due, a landlord may terminate the lease after giving not less than ten days notice, but not if the tenant pays the rent and fees in full before the notice period expires. Requires notice to a tenant regarding lease termination to include a statement about failure to pay rent and fees. Provides that notice is not required to terminate a formal or informal lease in certain situations. Requires a court to hear a cause of action filed by a tenant to enforce an obligation of a landlord no later than 30 days after the date of filing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback