IN SB0420 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Amendment #1 (Sullivan) prevailed; voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Amendment #1 (Sullivan) prevailed; voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce development. Provides for certification by the governor's workforce cabinet of an industry collaboration organization (ICO). Provides that an organization qualifies as an ICO if the organization meets certain qualification requirements. Provides that contributions to an ICO may be used by the ICO for the following purposes: (1) To support the development and implementation of high school graduation pathways. (2) To provide money to the industry collaboration organization to establish and operate a career counseling program for students. (3) To enhance career and technical education and training programs. (4) To expand apprenticeships and work based learning opportunities. (5) To provide grants to schools to be used by the school to pay the transportation costs for students to attend an eligible training program. (6) Any other course or program, if the course or program leads to the attainment of a specific employment related credential that documents the student's skills for employment success. (7) To partner with other industry collaboration organizations, nonprofits, public foundations, or other entities to provide workforce related educational programs or training for students. Requires that an ICO report certain information to the governor's workforce cabinet. Requires the governor's workforce cabinet to support a industry collaboration organization in sharing and scaling best practices on a statewide basis by: (1) conducting an annual survey of the business, education, and community organizations participating in the industry collaboration organization, in consultation with the management performance hub; and (2) convening the industry collaboration organizations on an ongoing basis in collaboration with Indiana's statewide business and industry associations. Provides that the governor's workforce cabinet shall annually compile lists of the: (1) industry sectors and geographic regions in which industry collaboration organizations are operating, disaggregated by industry category and region; and (2) business, educational institutions, and community organizations affiliated with the industry collaboration organizations established under this chapter, disaggregated by industry category and region. Amends the definition of "work based learning course" for purposes of determining career and technical education funding.
Title
Workforce development. Provides for certification by the governor's workforce cabinet of an industry collaboration organization (ICO). Provides that an organization qualifies as an ICO if the organization meets certain qualification requirements. Provides that contributions to an ICO may be used by the ICO for the following purposes: (1) To support the development and implementation of high school graduation pathways. (2) To provide money to the industry collaboration organization to establish and operate a career counseling program for students. (3) To enhance career and technical education and training programs. (4) To expand apprenticeships and work based learning opportunities. (5) To provide grants to schools to be used by the school to pay the transportation costs for students to attend an eligible training program. (6) Any other course or program, if the course or program leads to the attainment of a specific employment related credential that documents the student's skills for employment success. (7) To partner with other industry collaboration organizations, nonprofits, public foundations, or other entities to provide workforce related educational programs or training for students. Requires that an ICO report certain information to the governor's workforce cabinet. Requires the governor's workforce cabinet to support a industry collaboration organization in sharing and scaling best practices on a statewide basis by: (1) conducting an annual survey of the business, education, and community organizations participating in the industry collaboration organization, in consultation with the management performance hub; and (2) convening the industry collaboration organizations on an ongoing basis in collaboration with Indiana's statewide business and industry associations. Provides that the governor's workforce cabinet shall annually compile lists of the: (1) industry sectors and geographic regions in which industry collaboration organizations are operating, disaggregated by industry category and region; and (2) business, educational institutions, and community organizations affiliated with the industry collaboration organizations established under this chapter, disaggregated by industry category and region. Amends the definition of "work based learning course" for purposes of determining career and technical education funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Amendment #1 (Sullivan) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-11 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-04-09 | House | Representative Prescott added as cosponsor |
2019-04-08 | House | Representative Goodrich added as cosponsor |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative VanNatter |
2019-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: yeas 44, nays 5 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senators Glick and Ruckelshaus added as coauthors |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |