IN SB0417 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Representative Lawson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Representative Lawson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Health provider reporting of domestic violence.
Title
Health provider reporting of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | Representative Lawson added as cosponsor |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. McNamara |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 36 and nays 12 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Tallian), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Waltz |