IN SB0413 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Charter school study committee. Establishes a panel to study charter school funding and methods for improving school building utilization by a school corporation.
Title
Charter school study committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] |
Rep. John Prescott [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Amendment #7 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - House - Amendment #7 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 163 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-22 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 506: yeas 74, nays 23 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 491: yeas 30, nays 19 |
2021-04-21 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Representative Davis added as conferee |
2021-04-21 | House | Representative DeLaney removed as conferee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as conferee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senator Melton removed as conferee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senator Kruse removed as advisor |
2021-04-15 | House | House advisors appointed: Clere, Goodrich, Pfaff and Smith V |
2021-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and DeLaney |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Ford J.D. and Rogers |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | Representative Clere added as cosponsor |
2021-04-13 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 431: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 408: yeas 29, nays 67 |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment #2 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment #7 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 407: yeas 30, nays 59 |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment #3 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment #8 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment #9 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-12 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Prescott |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 203: yeas 32, nays 15 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |