IN SB0410 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Unlicensed caregiver intervention in juvenile court proceeding. Defines "unlicensed caregiver" and allows an unlicensed caregiver of a child to intervene as a party in a: (1) child in need of services proceeding; or (2) proceeding to terminate the parent-child relationship; concerning the child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlicensed caregiver intervention in juvenile court proceeding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-10SenatePublic Law 68
2022-03-10SenateSigned by the Governor
2022-03-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2022-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2022-03-07SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2022-03-02SenateSenator Niemeyer added as coauthor
2022-03-02SenateSenators Ford J.D., Yoder, Niezgodski, Qaddoura added as coauthors
2022-03-02SenateSenators Boots and Donato added as coauthors
2022-03-02SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2022-03-02SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 327: yeas 47, nays 0
2022-02-24SenateMotion to concur filed
2022-02-24SenateDissent withdrawn
2022-02-24HouseHouse advisors appointed: Jordan, Young J, Hatfield and Smith V
2022-02-24HouseHouse conferees appointed: Pressel and Bauer M
2022-02-24SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2022-02-23SenateMotion to dissent filed
2022-02-23HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2022-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 92, nays 0
2022-02-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-02-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2022-02-01SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2022-02-01SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2022-02-01SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2022-02-01SenateCosponsors: Representatives Jordan, Gutwein, Soliday
2022-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Pressel
2022-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 49, nays 0
2022-02-01SenateSenator Pol added as coauthor
2022-01-31SenateSenators Crider and Ford Jon added as coauthors
2022-01-31SenateAmendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2022-01-31SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-01-31SenateSenators Buck, Lanane, Young M, Garten, Randolph, Gaskill added as coauthors
2022-01-31SenateSenator Zay added as third author
2022-01-31SenateSenator Alting added as second author
2022-01-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/senate/410/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/8/c/9c8c3a77/SB0410.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/d/e/a4ded3bd/SB0410.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/a/f/aeafb06a/SB0410.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/d/c/03dc35a1/SB0410.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/4/3/c3432095/SB0410.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/7/a/2c7a6a4a/SB0410.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/e/8/0ce8cff4/SB0410.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/8/8/0988a0ad/SB0410.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/4/a/464a3eb7/SB0410.05.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/7/b/fd7b971c/SB0410.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/e/b/22eb1676/SB0410.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/5/8/07588eef/SB0410.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/1/e/4b1e0d19/SB0410.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/1/d/6a1dc7a1/SB0410.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/5/3/8153e438/SB0410.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/1/3/80132273/SB0410.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/3/e/3d3e8d63/SB0410.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/8/c/8d8c1278/SB0410.04.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/f/a/76fab05d/SB0410.04.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/0/6/4906bb9f/SB0410.04.COMH.DIS01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/1/e/051efcc4/SB0410.04.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/2/4/e6249804/SB0410.05.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/8/3/df831fcd/SB0410.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/9/7/409770e9/SB0410.190_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/5/4/ef54806d/SB0410.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/c/2/87c2d61f/SB0410.245_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/a/d/6badf8f1/SB0410.327_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback