IN SB0409 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Court fees. Extends the mortgage foreclosure counseling and education court fee until July 1, 2017.
Title
Court fees. Extends the mortgage foreclosure counseling and education court fee until July 1, 2017.
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Huston added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 129: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |