IN SB0409 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a county auditor to place a notation on the tax duplicate when the county auditor determines that property is no longer eligible for a standard deduction and indicates that a bona fide purchaser of the property is not liable for taxes and penalties that accrue before the notation is made as a result of the removal of the deduction. Indicates that certain defects in a lease recorded with the county recorder do not invalidate the effect of recording the lease.
Title
Recording notices concerning taxes and property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 040901 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 040901 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Clere added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 129: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as second author. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | SB 409 Amendment #1 (Zakas), prevailed. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Civil Law |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zakas. |