IN SB0407 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a hospital holding a Type II pharmacy permit to offer drugs and devices to certain individuals who work or volunteer at the hospital and their dependents. Allows a pharmacist to supervise not more than six licensed pharmacy technicians or pharmacy technicians in training at any time. (Currently, a pharmacist may supervise not more than four licensed pharmacy technicians or pharmacy technicians in training.) Prohibits the Indiana board of pharmacy from issuing a pharmacy technician certificate to an individual who has been convicted of a felony involving controlled substances. Allows a pharmacist, upon request of the patient, to dispense a 90 day supply of a prescription under specified circumstances. Requires the pharmacist to notify the prescriber of the change in the quantity filled and inform the customer concerning whether the additional drug supply of the prescription is covered under the patient's insurance. Specifies pharmacy audit requirements, including notice procedures and limitations on an initial audit and onsite audits. Requires a period of at least 30 days during which a pharmacy may appeal preliminary audit report findings. Provides for the correction of clerical errors. Requires the health finance commission to study during the 2012 legislative interim: (1) the issue of certain pharmacies and whether any limitation should be placed on the dispensing of a prescription drug by the pharmacies; and (2) specified health insurance plans and the number of covered people with copayments, coinsurance amounts, and out-of-pocket costs incurred for prescription drugs that exceed specified amounts for the coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-20 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-14 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-13 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 348: yeas 49, nays 0
2012-03-09 Senate Rule 86(a) suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 400: yeas 94, nays 2
2012-03-09 Rules suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-05 House advisors appointed: T. Brown, C. Fry and Stemler
2012-03-05 House conferees appointed: Davisson and Welch
2012-03-05 Senate advisor appointed: Lawson and Rogers
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Grooms and Breaux
2012-03-05 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-03-01 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-03-01 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 322: yeas 97, nays 0
2012-02-29 Amendment 4 (Davisson), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-29 Amendment 3 (Welch), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-29 Amendment 1 (C. Fry), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-29 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-23 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2012-02-01 Cosponsors: Reps. Davisson and Stemler
2012-02-01 House sponsor: Rep. Welch
2012-02-01 Referred to the House
2012-02-01 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 49 and nays 0
2012-01-30 Senator Breaux added as coauthor
2012-01-30 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-26 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2012-01-09 Authored by Senator Grooms

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback