IN SB0406 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Postsecondary enrollment opportunities.
Title
Postsecondary enrollment opportunities.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Earline Rogers [D] |
Sen. Scott Schneider [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 125 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 459: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-03-25 | House | Representative V. Smith added as cosponsor |
2013-03-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 329: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-03-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senator Schneider added as coauthor |
2013-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Rhoads |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senators Banks and Kruse |