IN SB0400 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health care matters. Requires the state employee health plan, policies of accident and sickness insurance, and health maintenance organization contracts to provide coverage for wearable cardioverter defibrillators. Specifies requirements for credentialing a provider for the Medicaid program, an accident and sickness insurance policy, and a health maintenance organization contract. Establishes a provisional credential until a decision is made on a provider's credentialing application and allows for retroactive reimbursement. Provides that a hospital's quality assessment and improvement program must include a process for determining and reporting the occurrence of serious reportable events. Provides that the medical staff of a hospital may make recommendations on the granting of clinical privileges and the appointment or reappointment of an applicant to the governing board for a period not to exceed 36 months. Requires a hospital with an emergency department to have at least one physician on site and on duty who is responsible for the emergency department. Requires the legislative services agency to conduct an analysis of licensing fees and provide a report to the budget committee. Allows the commissioner of the department of insurance (commissioner) to issue an order to discontinue a violation of a law (current law specifies orders or rules). Requires the commissioner to consider specified information before approving or disapproving a premium rate increase. Requires a domestic stock insurer to file specified information with the department of insurance. Prohibits the state employee health plan from requiring prior authorization for certain specified services. Changes prior authorization time requirements for urgent care situations. Adds an employee benefit plan that is subject to the federal Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 and a state employee health plan to the definition of "health payer" for the purposes of the all payer claims data base (data base). Allows the department of insurance to adopt rules on certain matters concerning the data base. Requires a health plan to post certain information on the health plan's website. Prohibits an insurer and a health maintenance organization from altering a CPT code for a claim or paying for a CPT code of lesser monetary value unless: (1) the CPT code submitted is not in accordance with certain guidelines and rules, or the terms and conditions of a participating provider's agreement or contract with the insurer or health maintenance organization; or (2) the medical record of the claim has been reviewed by an employee or contractor of the insurer or health maintenance organization. Requires an insurer and a health maintenance organization to provide a contracted provider with a current reimbursement rate schedule at specified times. Urges the study by an interim committee of: (1) prior authorization exemptions for certain health care providers; and (2) whether Indiana should adopt an interstate mobility of occupational licensing. Requires a collaborating physician or physician designee to review certain patient encounters performed by a physician assistant within 14 business days. Requires a health plan to offer a health care provider the option to request a peer to peer review by a clinical peer concerning an adverse determination on a prior authorization request.
Title
Health care matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Summers) failed (Y: 28 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Summers) failed (Y: 28 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Public Law 190 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 492: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 509: yeas 90, nays 1 |
2023-04-25 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Melton and Garten |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Yoder |
2023-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: Barrett, Carbaugh, Zent, Hatfield and Porter |
2023-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: King and Fleming |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-12 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-04-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 388: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2023-04-10 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-04-10 | House | Amendment #1 (Summers) failed; Roll Call 375: yeas 28, nays 67 |
2023-04-10 | House | Amendment #2 (King) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Barrett, Carbaugh, Fleming |
2023-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative King |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senators Johnson and Rogers added as coauthors |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senator Garten added as third author |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2023-01-19 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |
Subjects
BUDGETS AND APPROPRIATIONS
CHILDREN AND MINORS, Children with Special Health Needs
DENTISTS AND DENTISTRY; DENTAL HYGIENISTS
HEALTH, State Department and Agencies
HUMAN SERVICES, Regulation and Licensing of Professionals
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL; LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
STUDY COMMITTEES
WELFARE, Medicaid
CHILDREN AND MINORS, Children with Special Health Needs
DENTISTS AND DENTISTRY; DENTAL HYGIENISTS
HEALTH, State Department and Agencies
HUMAN SERVICES, Regulation and Licensing of Professionals
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL; LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
STUDY COMMITTEES
WELFARE, Medicaid