IN SB0396 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Representative Klinker added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Guardian reimbursement and Medicaid eligibility. Specifies that an amount not to exceed $175 a month in court ordered guardianship fees for an individual who is: (1) in an institution; or (2) applying for or participating in the Medicaid aged and disabled waiver; is exempt from Medicaid income eligibility consideration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardian reimbursement and Medicaid eligibility. Specifies that an amount not to exceed $175 a month in court ordered guardianship fees for an individual who is: (1) in an institution; or (2) applying for or participating in the Medicaid aged and disabled waiver; is exempt from Medicaid income eligibility consideration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23HouseRepresentative Klinker added as cosponsor
2017-03-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2017-03-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2017-02-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-01-31SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Frizzell
2017-01-31SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 50: yeas 46, nays 3
2017-01-30SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-01-30SenateSenator Ford added as second author
2017-01-30SenateSenator Ford removed as coauthor
2017-01-30SenateAmendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
2017-01-30SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-01-26SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2017-01-24SenateSenator Ford added as coauthor
2017-01-23SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2017-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/396/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/f/7/20f71106/SB0396.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/4/4/be44e567/SB0396.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/6/f/266f7a58/SB0396.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/f/6/d5f61413/SB0396.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/1/7/3817d740/SB0396.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/1/7/a717d2cf/SB0396.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/c/9/b8c9e799/SB0396.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/e/e/7aee61a4/SB0396.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/9/e/1e9ef6f8/SB0396.50.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/7/7/bc775aa5/SB0396.03.ENGS.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback