IN SB0392 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medication. Defines "emergency medication" as epinephrine, albuterol, or naloxone. Allows a school or school corporation to: (1) fill a prescription for an emergency medication; and (2) store the emergency medication. (Current law allows a school to fill a prescription for auto-injectable epinephrine and store the auto-injectable epinephrine.) Defines "emergency stock medication" as emergency medication to which both the following apply: (1) The prescription of the emergency medication is filled by a school or school corporation. (2) The emergency medication is stored at a school. Provides that injectable epinephrine filled by certain entities must have an expiration date of not
Title
Emergency medication. Defines "emergency medication" as epinephrine, albuterol, or naloxone. Allows a school or school corporation to: (1) fill a prescription for an emergency medication; and (2) store the emergency medication. (Current law allows a school to fill a prescription for auto-injectable epinephrine and store the auto-injectable epinephrine.) Defines "emergency stock medication" as emergency medication to which both the following apply: (1) The prescription of the emergency medication is filled by a school or school corporation. (2) The emergency medication is stored at a school. Provides that injectable epinephrine filled by certain entities must have an expiration date of not
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 117 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 354: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Ober, Shackleford, Pierce |
2017-02-13 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Davisson |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 95: yeas 39, nays 10 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senators Breaux, Head, Leising added as coauthors |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stoops |